Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Blankenship, Caitlin Elizabeth, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Zamora, Garrett Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Titiana D. Frausto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTitiana D. Frausto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 31, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Divorce (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Frausto, Titiana) | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO |
|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
DECREE OF DIVORCE - DEFAULT (OCA) 7 PGS - SIGNED ON 3/31/2021 7 PGS - SIGNED ON 3/31/2021 |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED GARRET ZAMORA - 11/27/2020 GARRET ZAMORA - 11/27/2020 |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | FAMILY SCHEDULE REVIEW-9 Months | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED GARRETT ZAMORA - EFILED TO ATTY GARRETT ZAMORA - EFILED TO ATTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.