Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Miles, Keya Dayvet, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Miles, Andrew Fritzgerald, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER (RETURNED BY JUDGE) ***SIGNED A DIFFERENT ORDER*** ***SIGNED A DIFFERENT ORDER*** |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Barbara Younger, C.S.R., Petitioner appeared via zoom pro se. Respondent appeared pro se via zoom. Petitioner - sworn and testified. Respondent- sworn and testified. JMC ; M=PR; c/s = 400/mo. SPO. Name change- Johnson Barbara Younger, C.S.R., Petitioner appeared via zoom pro se. Respondent appeared pro se via zoom. Petitioner - sworn and testified. Respondent- sworn and testified. JMC ; M=PR; c/s = 400/mo. SPO. Name change- Johnson |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Divorce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Pro Se Divorce (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Barbara Younger, C.S.R., both parties appeared pro se. Both parties sworn and testified. Parties cannot agree to the amount of child support and not prepared to litigate the issue. Case continued. Barbara Younger, C.S.R., both parties appeared pro se. Both parties sworn and testified. Parties cannot agree to the amount of child support and not prepared to litigate the issue. Case continued. |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 1 PAGE SIGNED ON 10-13-2020 1 PAGE SIGNED ON 10-13-2020 |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER NOTICE OF HEARING - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ NOTICE OF HEARING - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | PRO SE ADVISEMENT AND INFO (of party filing) | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INABILITY TO PAY COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.