Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Valleyview Church Of The Nazarene, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Preston J Dugas, Iii, against Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., represented by Lindsey P. Burning, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2020 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Consumer/Dtpa |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
ANSWER CHURCH MUTUAL INSURANCE/LINDSEY BURNING CHURCH MUTUAL INSURANCE/LINDSEY BURNING |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED CHURCH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY - 9/2/2020 - $75.00 PROCESS SERVER CHURCH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY - 9/2/2020 - $75.00 PROCESS SERVER |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | CIVIL SCHEDULE REVIEW-18 Months | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED CHURCH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY - EFILED TO ATTY CHURCH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY - EFILED TO ATTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.