Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Brashear, Parker, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Susan E. Hutchison, against City Of Weatherford, represented by James T. Jeffrey, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGraham Quisenberry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Other |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Petition | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Response | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.