Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Herc Rentals, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Heather Lane Winkles, against Cc Welding & Sandblasting Services Llc, Callaway, Casey, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Callaway, Casey Served 08/25/2021 | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.