Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Borski, Janayle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Borski, Joshua Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Craig Towson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig Towson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Order of Dismissal Mailed | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Towson, Craig) Result: Dismissed | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court's Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.