Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sanders, Steven, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by John Robert Loar, Jr., against Bryant, Ryan, Encore Oilfield Service, Llc, represented by Thomas W. Fee, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Craig Towson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig Towson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Towson, Craig) | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | RULE 166 PRETRIAL (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Towson, Craig) | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Deposition | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Deposition | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Business Records Affidavit | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Deposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.