Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Rogoff-Klein, Inna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRogoff-Klein, Inna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice Judgment Notice |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Rogoff-Klein, Inna ) Final Judgment Final Judgment |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Last Known Address Certificate Certificate Of Last Known Address |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Rogoff-Klein, Inna ) Final Judgment Final Judgment |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Non Military Affidavit Non Military Affidavit |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service-Brandon E. Acosta Return of Service-Brandon E. Acosta |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Substituted Service Order (Judicial Officer: Rogoff-Klein, Inna ) Order for Substituted Service |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Rogoff-Klein, Inna ) Order for Substituted Service Order for Substituted Service |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substituted Service Motion Motion for Substituted Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.