Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Valdez, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValdez, Carlos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice Judgment Notice |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Agreed Judgment (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Carlos ) (signed) (signed) |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 Settlement Agreement Rule 11 Settlement Agreement |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Agreed Judgment Agreed Judgment |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service Katherine Broomfield Return of Service Katherine Broomfield |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Broomfield, Katherine E Served 04/15/2021 Response Due 05/10/2021 Returned 04/16/2021 | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Broomfield, Katherine E Unserved | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed Plaintiff's Original Petition Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.