Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Deceptive Trade Practices - Consumer case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryDeceptive Trade Practice |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDeceptive Trade Practices |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Plaintiff s Notice Of Removal Plaintiff s Notice Of Removal |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Suggestion/Notice of Bankruptcy (OCA) | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Rogoff-Klein, Inna ) Temporary Restraining Order Temporary Restraining Order |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Plaintiff's Third Amended Petition and Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction Plaintiff's Third Amended Petition and Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer of Third-Party Defendant Brandon Marshall to Defendant Gainco, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim of Third-Party Defendant Brandon Marshall to Defendant Gainco, Inc.'s Third-Party Claim |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Plaintiffs' Original Answer to Counterclaims Plaintiffs' Original Answer to Counterclaims |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant, Theresa Nix's Original Answer Defendant, Theresa Nix's Original Answer |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement Cover Letter Rule 11 Agreement Cover Letter Rule 11 Agreement |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Plaintiff's First Amended Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.