Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Jerry Workman Enterprises, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Culbreth, Kenneth M., Jr., Vreeland, James S., against Bl Marina Properties, L.P., The Cape Corpus, Inc, represented by Nevelow, Craig A., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGalvan, Bobby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2023 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedJune 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment | |
May 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Completion of Discovery | |
May 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Daubert/Robinson Challenges | |
May 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Amendment of Pleadings | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Designation of Experts: Defendant | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Alternative Dispute Resolution | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Agreed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.