Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Valdez, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValdez, Carlos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice Judgment Notice |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Carlos ) Final Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights Redacted (signed) Final Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights Redacted (signed) |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Carlos ) Final Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights (signed) Final Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights (signed) |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Carlos ) Final Order Approving Transfer Of Structured Redacted Final Order Approving Transfer Of Structured Redacted |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Carlos ) Final Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights Final Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Valdez, Carlos) STRUC. STLMNT; VIA ZOOM Meeting ID: 981 7669 7277 Result: Held STRUC. STLMNT; VIA ZOOM Meeting ID: 981 7669 7277 |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice of Hearing on Application for Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights Notice of Hearing on Application for Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Carlos ) Application For Approval Of Transfer Of Structured Settlement Payment Rights Application For Approval Of Transfer Of Structured Settlement Payment Rights |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.