Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Protective Order Signed (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Stith, David ) | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Stith, David) P.O. P.O. |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 1 Petitioner's Exhibit 1 |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 2-Text Messages Petitioner's Exhibit 2-Text Messages |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice To Respondent Notice Notice To Respondent |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order (Judicial Officer: Stith, David ) Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order And Order Setting Hearing 03/30/2021 @9:00am Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order And Order Setting Hearing 03/30/2021 @9:00am |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Texas Crime Information Center TCIC TCIC |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application for a Protective Order Application Application for a Protective Order |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Application for Protective Order (Notice) Landeros, Carlos Served 03/18/2021 Returned 03/22/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.