Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Sandra L. Watts presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. Watts Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2021 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing (OCA) (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Watts, Sandra L.) | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice Judgment Notice |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order Order (Judicial Officer: Huerta, Martha ) Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee) Motion for Non-Suit Motion for Non-Suit |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Non-Suit Order (Judicial Officer: Huerta, Martha ) Order Granting Non-Suit |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Watts, Sandra L. ) Order Granting Non-Suit Order Granting Non-Suit |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter in Re: Exhibit Audio File ( EMAILED COURT CLERK AND PLACED A COPY OF THIS LETTER WITH CD PLACED IN ENVELOPE IN COURT CLERK BOX) in Re: Exhibit Audio File ( EMAILED COURT CLERK AND PLACED A COPY OF THIS LETTER WITH CD PLACED IN ENVELOPE IN COURT CLERK BOX) |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion To Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order Motion Motion To Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Texas Crime Information Center TCIC Form TCIC Form |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Watts, Sandra L. ) Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.