Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Watts, Sandra L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWatts, Sandra L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 05, 2021 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice Judgment Notice |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Protective Order Signed (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Watts, Sandra L. ) | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Watts, Sandra L.) for Protective Order for Protective Order |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibits 4 Exhibit Exhibits 4 |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Petitioner's Exhbits 1 Petitioner's Exhbits 1 |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Application for Protective Order (Notice) Ramirez, Desiree Served 03/09/2021 Returned 03/15/2021 | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Identifier Identifier |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Watts, Sandra L. ) Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order and Order Setting Hearing Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order and Order Setting Hearing |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.