Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Watts, Sandra L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWatts, Sandra L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Banales, J. Manuel) 20 minutes 10/26/2022 Reset by Court to 11/15/2022 Result: Held 20 minutes |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Watts, Sandra L. ) Agreed Final Decree of Divorce and Order for Conservatorship and Child Support Agreed Final Decree of Divorce and Order for Conservatorship and Child Support |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Watts, Sandra L.) 1 hr - LIVE COURTROOM HEARING 07/05/2022 Reset by Court to 07/21/2022 07/21/2022 Reset by Court to 07/28/2022 07/28/2022 Reset by Court to 08/05/2022 1 hr - LIVE COURTROOM HEARING |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Inventory Inventory |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Suggestions to the Court Suggestions to the Court |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness List Respondent's Witness List Respondent's Witness List |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Suggestions To The Court Suggestions To The Court |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Current Address Notice Notice of Current Address |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice Judgment Notice |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Watts, Sandra L. ) Agreed Final Protective Order Agreed Final Protective Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.