Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Carlos Valdez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarlos Valdez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders (signed) Temporary Order (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Carlos ) Temporary Orders (signed) |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Carlos ) Temporary Orders Temporary Orders |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Valdez, Carlos) TEMP ORD; VIA ZOOM Meeting ID: 955 9369 3918 TEMP ORD; VIA ZOOM Meeting ID: 955 9369 3918 |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 Agreement | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Other CANCELED Temporary Orders (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Valdez, Carlos) Other TEMP ORD VIA ZOOM ID 96130632008 |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service Douglas Kaye Return of Service Douglas Kaye |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Affidavit of Service Douglas Kaye SHOW CAUSE Affidavit of Service Douglas Kaye SHOW CAUSE |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Show Cause Kaye, Douglas Served 02/23/2021 Returned 02/24/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.