Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Watts, Sandra L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWatts, Sandra L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2021 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice Judgment Notice |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Protective Order Signed (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Watts, Sandra L. ) | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Protective Order Protective Order |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice TCIC TCIC |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Watts, Sandra L.) for Protective Order for Protective Order |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Exhibit 2 Exhibit 2 |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 4 Petitioner's Exhibit 4 |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 1 Petitioner's Exhibit 1 |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibits 3 Petitioner's Exhibits 3 |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Rogoff-Klein, Inna ) Temporary Ex parte Protective Order and Order Setting Hearing Temporary Ex parte Protective Order and Order Setting Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.