Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Robert M. Galvan, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M. Galvan, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Galvan, Bobby) | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Petitioner's Certificate of Written Discovery Directed to Respondent Petitioner's Certificate of Written Discovery Directed to Respondent |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Affidavit of Service - John Edward Medina (Show Cause) Affidavit of Service - John Edward Medina (Show Cause) |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Affidavit of Service-John Edward Medina (Citation) Affidavit of Service-John Edward Medina (Citation) |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Show Cause Medina, John Edward Served 02/06/2021 Returned 02/09/2021 | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Medina, John Edward Served 02/09/2021 Response Due 03/08/2021 | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) 1ST AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING FOR TEMP ORDERS AND ORDER TO APPEAR 1ST AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING FOR TEMP ORDERS AND ORDER TO APPEAR |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders and Order to Appear Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders and Order to Appear |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Service Request Information Sheet - Service Requested Amended Amended Service Request Information Sheet - Service Requested |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.