Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ledezma, Felipe, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Colby, Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Jennifer J. Robin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennifer J. Robin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Docket Control Order
Date: August 12, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 14, 2021Original Answer
Date: August 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.)
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.)
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order- Joint Motion to Waive Mediation for Temporary Orders Proposed Order |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion (No Fee) | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Docket Control Order |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Original Answer Original Answer |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationColby, Jessica Unserved | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Request For Service | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition for Divorce E-Filed Original Petition Document |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.