Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Jacobs-Smith, Kiarah Renee, Mills, Demetric Roshad, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with J. C. Durst presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJ. C. Durst Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
Category(Title Iv-D Oag Use Only) Establishment |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Durst, J.C.)
Judge: Durst, J.C. |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship Signed Order |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Durst, J.C.)
Judge: Durst, J.C. |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Clerk's Notice Letter to Demetric Roshad Mills Letters |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Parentage Testing Signed Order |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Durst, J.C.)
Judge: Durst, J.C. |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.