Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Mccowan, John Lee, Jr., Kizzie, Shabrianna Traimaine, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Robin, Jennifer J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin, Jennifer J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
Category(Title Iv-D Oag Use Only) Establishment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: August 31, 2021Signed Order
Date: August 12, 2021Letters
Date: May 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismiss for Want of Prosecution CANCELED Dismiss for Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.) Case Disposed Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Nonsuit Order Granting Nonsuit Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss Signed Order Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Durst, J.C.)
Judge: Durst, J.C. |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
No Fee Documents
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
CitationMcCowan, John Lee, Jr. Returned Unserved 05/27/2021Returned05/27/2021
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Letters Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.