Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The Independent Savings Plan Company D B A Ispc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Brian G Sayer, against Dobbins, James, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSantini, Vincenzo J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryContract Consumer/Commercial/Debt <$100,000 Incl. Damages |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Abstract of Judgement
Date: February 03, 2023Request
Date: February 02, 2023Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: April 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Abstract of Judgment Abstract of Judgement Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
ServiceDobbins, James Unserved
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Abstract of Judgment Request Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Signed Default Judgment Default Judgment Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address Certificate Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Military Status Affidavit Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service - Executed to James Dobbins Return of Service Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.