Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Molina, Lenim Misdael, Molina, Angela Arabel, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Moreland, Charles T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMoreland, Charles T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
Category(Title Iv-D Oag Use Only) Establishment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Signed Order
Date: April 12, 2021Proposed Order
Date: April 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Order After Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate
Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Durst, J.C.)
Judge: Durst, J.C. |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
(Title IV-D OAG Use Only) Service Documents
Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
CitationMolina, Lenim MisdaelServed04/22/2021Returned04/26/2021
Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Signed Order Setting Hearing set for June 8, 2021 at 1:00 A.M. Signed Order Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Service
Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
(TItle IV-D OAG Use Only) Establishment
Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.