Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Brett W Ligon, against 2000 Suzuki Bearing Vin: Js1Gw71A6Y2103849, Justin Alexander Ruiz, Administrator Of The Estate Of Raul Ruiz, Deceased, Santos, Brandon Christopher, represented by Neil Calfas, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Santini, Vincenzo J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSantini, Vincenzo J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryRelated To Crim - Seizure/Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
No Fee Documents
Date: June 15, 2021Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: October 25, 2021Bench Trial
Date: November 18, 2021Return of Service
Date: May 03, 2021Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: April 08, 2021Notice of Nonsuit
Date: October 21, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: May 18, 2021Original Answer
Date: May 07, 2021Return of Service
Date: May 04, 2021Request For Service
Date: April 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order - Forfeiture (11/18/21) Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J) Case Disposed Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Santini, Vincenzo J)
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Nonsuit Order Granting Nonsuit Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit
Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Expert Designation No Fee Documents Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
457th - Docket Control Order - Forfeiture (11/18/21) Docket Control Order Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer - Justin Ruiz Original Answer Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service - Executed to Justin Alexander Ruiz Return of Service Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service - Executed to Brandon Santos Return of Service Judge: Santini, Vincenzo J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.