Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rosales, Armando G., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gonzales De Rosales, Delia H., in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Wonderly, Scott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWonderly, Scott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Docket Control Order
Date: June 07, 2021Original Answer
Date: April 27, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: April 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.) Agreed Resolution
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Submission CANCELED Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.) Agreed Resolution Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Prove-Up (2:30 PM) ()
Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry
Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Docket Control Order Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Original Answer Original Answer Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
CitationGonzales De Rosales, Delia H.Served04/25/2021Returned04/27/2021
Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Service
Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition for Divorce Original Petition (OCA) Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.