Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Johnston, Brady Jarrett, Johnston, Jarrett Brady, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Johnston, Jane Isla, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Wonderly, Scott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWonderly, Scott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Docket Control Order
Date: August 30, 2021Proposed Order
Date: August 09, 2021Original Answer
Date: June 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.) Agreed Resolution Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Submission CANCELED Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.) Agreed Resolution Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Notice Envelope Number:
Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Wonderly, Scott )
Judge: : Wonderly, Scott |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Prove-Up (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.)
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Agreed Final Decree of Divorce Proposed Order |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Docket Control Order Judge: Wonderly, Scott |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Prove-Up (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.)
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry (Judicial Officer: Wonderly, Scott )
Judge: : Wonderly, Scott |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.