Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lathers, Jennifer Whitlock, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lathers, Kenn Ray, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with William C. Bosworth, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Bosworth, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing - 08/31/2021 @ 1:30 p.m. *Emailed AG - 08/31/2021 @ 1:30 p.m. *Emailed AG |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
(LAC) Intervention - sent - sent |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Sheets Texas Health Resources Cleburne Texas Health Resources Cleburne |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Income Withholding Order for Support - signed 4/28/21 - sent to employer 5/3/21 - signed 4/28/21 - sent to employer 5/3/21 |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.