Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Benjamin, Franklin L., Rightmer-Benjamin, Angelia M., filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Payton, Ashley Lorraine, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Dennis W. Bridewell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis W. Bridewell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officers Weeks, John Wilson, Weeks, John Wilson) | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Agreed Order of Referral for Mediation - sent to court via que Agreed Order of Referral for Mediation - sent to court via que |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing Reset -Sent to Court -Sent to Court |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing Confirmation letter - Motion to Withdraw - 3/1/23 @ 2:30 - sent to court Confirmation letter - Motion to Withdraw - 3/1/23 @ 2:30 - sent to court |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel - sent to court - sent to court |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Notice of Hearing On Motion to Withdrawal - sent to court Notice of Hearing On Motion to Withdrawal - sent to court |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter Setting Hearing *coordinator sent* *coordinator sent* |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Transfer Due to Recusal emailed emailed |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Recusal emailed emailed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.