Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Skaggs, Aimee L., filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Skaggs, Charles Adam, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Sydney B. Hewlett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSydney B. Hewlett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Hewlett, Sydney B) Special Appearance/Plea to Jurisdiction Result: Held Special Appearance/Plea to Jurisdiction |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing for April 8, 2021 @1:30 pm- for April 8, 2021 @1:30 pm- |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Special Appearance Plea to the Jurishdiction, Request for Court to Decline Jurishdiction, and Original Answer Respondent's Special Appearance Plea to the Jurishdiction, Request for Court to Decline Jurishdiction, and Original Answer |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - EXECUTED 2-4-2021 - EXECUTED 2-4-2021 |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued - emailed to atty - emailed to atty |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Skaggs, Charles Served 02/04/2021 Returned 02/11/2021 | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition to Modify Parent-Child Relationship - Iss Cit - Iss Cit |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Judge to Confer with Child - Iss Cit - Iss Cit |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Forgein Judgment - Knox County, Tennessee Forgein Judgment - Knox County, Tennessee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.