Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Blanchette, Amanda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Blanchette, Douglas Justin, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBridewell, Wayne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ***** Scan Box 3670 ***** ***** Scan Box 3670 ***** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) pro se 1 child Result: Held pro se 1 child Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice /DECREE (given to both parties in court) /DECREE (given to both parties in court) Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Hearing Sent to Court in Box Sent to Court in Box Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce Original Petition for Divorce Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.