Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Stovall, Michell Lee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Stovall, James Floyd, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBridewell, Wayne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bailiff's Certificate of Call
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (10:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) zoom 973 3763 8175 Result: Held zoom 973 3763 8175 Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ***** Scan Box 3655 ***** ***** Scan Box 3655 ***** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice /DECREE (mailed to Michell Stovall & James Stovall) /DECREE (mailed to Michell Stovall & James Stovall) Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) zoom 980 6677 3792 Result: Held zoom 980 6677 3792 Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Setting Hearing
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Hearing -Put in Court Box -Put in Court Box Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned -Returned Executed on 01/05/2021 -Returned Executed on 01/05/2021 Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.