Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Snider, Joshua Allen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Snider, Lacey Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Hewlett, Sydney B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHewlett, Sydney B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ***** Scan Box 3669 ***** ***** Scan Box 3669 ***** Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce EMAILED EMAILED Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice/Decree MAILED MAILED Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Weeks, John Wilson) 02/15/2021 Reset by Court to 02/24/2021 Result: Held
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Setting Hearing 2-15-21
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Decree - Final Decree of Divorce - put in court box - Final Decree of Divorce - put in court box Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Hearing
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Completion Texas Cooperative Parenting Course Texas Cooperative Parenting Course Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.