Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Junkins, John, Junkins, Elouise, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Joe Yardas, against Rv Retailer Texas, Llc, Forest River, Inc., represented by D G Majors, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with William C. Bosworth, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Bosworth, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Passed | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Second Amended Original Petition Second Amended Original Petition |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Defendant's Notice of Hearing 10-27-2021 @ 2:30pm Defendant's Notice of Hearing 10-27-2021 @ 2:30pm |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave to Designate Responsible Third Party - Sent to Court via Queue Motion Motion for Leave to Designate Responsible Third Party - Sent to Court via Queue |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Leave to Designate Responsible Third Party - Sent to Court via Queue Order Granting Motion for Leave to Designate Responsible Third Party - Sent to Court via Queue |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Agreed proposed scheduling order - printed to file Agreed proposed scheduling order - printed to file |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Substitute Counsel | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Agreed Motion to Substitute Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.