Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Garcia, Jesse, Deleon, Joshua, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jeffery Pratt, against Secretary Of State, J7 Trucking, Llc., Garcia, Hector Manuel, represented by Mike H Bassett, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Sydney B. Hewlett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSydney B. Hewlett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2022 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Announcement (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) 03/24/2022 Continued to 09/01/2022 - Party Unavailable - Deleon, Joshua; Garcia, Hector Manuel; Garcia, Jesse; J7 TRUCKING, LLC.; Secretary of State 04/07/2022 Reset by Court to 03/24/2022 | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Summary Judgment (1:45 PM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Continue (1:45 PM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (1:45 PM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) P's Motion to Compel Defendants J7 Trucking, LLC and Hector Manuel Torres to Respond to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production Result: Held P's Motion to Compel Defendants J7 Trucking, LLC and Hector Manuel Torres to Respond to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Defendant's Motion - Order on Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Order on Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Defendants' Objections To Plaintiffs' Summary Judgement Evidence-sent to court via queue Defendants' Objections To Plaintiffs' Summary Judgement Evidence-sent to court via queue |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order -Order Granting Defendant's Objections To The Plaintiff's Response Motion For Summary Judgment Evidence- sent to court via queue -Order Granting Defendant's Objections To The Plaintiff's Response Motion For Summary Judgment Evidence- sent to court via queue |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney Correspondence | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Hearing -Amended Notice Of Hearing 8-4-22 @1:45pm sent to court via que -Amended Notice Of Hearing 8-4-22 @1:45pm sent to court via que |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.