Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Corbet Design Build, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Patrick J Schurr, against Ipm Construction, Inc. F K A D&G Quality Roofing, Inc., represented by Trey Harlin, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Strother, Tiffany) | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Strother, Tiffany) | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Withdrawal of Notice of Hearing on Defendant's Counsel's Motion to Withdraw-Sent to Court Que Withdrawal of Notice of Hearing on Defendant's Counsel's Motion to Withdraw-Sent to Court Que |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Order Granting Agreed Motion on Subsitute Counsel - emailed Order Granting Agreed Motion on Subsitute Counsel - emailed |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Agreed Motion to Substitute Counsel-Sent to Court Que Agreed Motion to Substitute Counsel-Sent to Court Que |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing for 09/26/2022 @9:45 am-Sent to court via que for 09/26/2022 @9:45 am-Sent to court via que |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw -Ensley Benitez Law, P.C.'s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant-Printed -Ensley Benitez Law, P.C.'s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant-Printed |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket Other CANCELED Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Other |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreed Scheduling Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.