Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Grant, Emma, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Andy Rubenstein, against Coleman, Nicholas Ryan, Indemnity Insurance Company Of North America D B A Chubb Agribusiness, represented by Alicia G Curran, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - EXECUTED 2-9-2021 - EXECUTED 2-9-2021 |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer - Defendant Indemnity Insurance Company of North America's Original Answer, Special Exceptions, and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition - Defendant Indemnity Insurance Company of North America's Original Answer, Special Exceptions, and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - EXECUTED 1-14-2021 - EXECUTED 1-14-2021 |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Plaintiff's Original Petition, Requests for Disclosure, Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production - Iss cits Plaintiff's Original Petition, Requests for Disclosure, Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production - Iss cits |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation COLEMAN, NICHOLAS RYAN Served 02/09/2021 Returned 02/10/2021 Indemnity Insurance Company of North America D/B/A Chubb Agribusiness Served 01/14/2021 Returned 01/19/2021 | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued - emailed to atty - emailed to atty |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.