Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Burleson Retail, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gregory A. Whittmore, against Wang, Bunny, Foot Joy, Llc, Ao, Qing, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with William C. Bosworth, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Bosworth, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Summary Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter to Judge -Put in Court Box -Put in Court Box |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Final Summary Judgment - put in court box - Final Summary Judgment - put in court box |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer -Plaintiffs Answer, Reply, Objection, and Special Exceptions to Defendants Counterpetition, Request to Deny Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Monetary Relief -Plaintiffs Answer, Reply, Objection, and Special Exceptions to Defendants Counterpetition, Request to Deny Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Monetary Relief |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Counter/Cross Petition -Defts' Counter Pet, Req to Deny Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment & Req for Monetary Relief - NOH - signed 6-3-21 -Defts' Counter Pet, Req to Deny Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment & Req for Monetary Relief - NOH - signed 6-3-21 |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Fiat | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter Requesting Hearing | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned EXECUTED 12-28-2020 EXECUTED 12-28-2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.