Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Robertson, Nicole, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by R. Rieker Carsey, against First Student, Inc., represented by Edward A Davis, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBridewell, Wayne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment/Non Jury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ***** Scan Box 3681 ***** ***** Scan Box 3681 ***** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice /ORDER (emailed attys Rieker Carsey, Edward Davis & DeeAnn Strother) /ORDER (emailed attys Rieker Carsey, Edward Davis & DeeAnn Strother) Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Dirk Weeks, CSSC of Dirk Weeks, CSSC Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sealed Document Filed
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order AND FINAL JUDGMENT REGARDING APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS AND FINAL JUDGMENT REGARDING APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) minor prove up Result: Held minor prove up Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing for April 21, 2021 @3:30 pm-Sent to court via que for April 21, 2021 @3:30 pm-Sent to court via que Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer of Guardian Ad Litem
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Motion -Amended Agreed Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem-Sent to court via que -Amended Agreed Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem-Sent to court via que Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.