Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donald D. Degrasse, against Gilley, Troy, Texas Secretary Of State, Tfw Industrial Supply & Cnc Machine Llc, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bosworth, William C, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBosworth, William C, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 24, 2020 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.)
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order -Default Judgment against TFW Industrial Supply & CNC Machine, LLC aka FTW IND and CNC LLC-Sent to court via que -Default Judgment against TFW Industrial Supply & CNC Machine, LLC aka FTW IND and CNC LLC-Sent to court via que Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment against TFW Industrial Supply and CNC Machine, LLC aka FTW IND and CNC LL-Sent to court via que against TFW Industrial Supply and CNC Machine, LLC aka FTW IND and CNC LL-Sent to court via que Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Proposed to Retain Cases on Docket-Sent to Court Proposed to Retain Cases on Docket-Sent to Court Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retain Case on Court's Docket
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter from Court
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned EXECUTED 07-29-2021 EXECUTED 07-29-2021 Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice/Judgment emailed atty & deft Troy Gilley (Interlocutory Default Judgment as to Troy Gilley only) emailed atty & deft Troy Gilley (Interlocutory Default Judgment as to Troy Gilley only) Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.