Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
New Tex Trucking, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Holly C. Hamm, against The Cumming Company, Inc., Barnstorm Resources Llc, Barnstorm Resources Ii Llc, represented by Vincent P Circelli, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment -Sent to court via que -Sent to court via que |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order -Final Judgment-Sent to court via que -Final Judgment-Sent to court via que |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - EXECUTED 11-30-2020 - EXECUTED 11-30-2020 |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - EXECUTED 11-24-2020 - EXECUTED 11-24-2020 |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service - EXECUTED 11-30-2020 - EXECUTED 11-30-2020 |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return of Service EXECUTED 11-30-2020 EXECUTED 11-30-2020 |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) - Plaintiff's Original Petition - Iss Cit - Plaintiff's Original Petition - Iss Cit |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation The Cumming Company, Inc. Unserved Barnstorm Resources II LLC Served 11/30/2020 Returned 12/04/2020 Barnstorm Resources LLC Served 11/30/2020 Returned 12/04/2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.