Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donald D. Degrasse, against Jcw Electronics Llp, Woods, Bradley M, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bosworth, William C, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBosworth, William C, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 20, 2020 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeCases Non-Suited Or Dismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ***** Scan Box 3619 ***** ***** Scan Box 3619 ***** Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice/Order emailed atty emailed atty Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice Without Prejudice Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letters from EZ Messenger with SASE Letter Letters from EZ Messenger with SASE Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter EZ Messenger EZ Messenger Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued -Emailed to attorney and Mail on 10/27/2020 -Emailed to attorney and Mail on 10/27/2020 Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation WOODS, BRADLEY M Unserved JCW ELECTRONICS LLP Unserved
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued -Emailed to attorney-and Mail on 10/27/2020 -Emailed to attorney-and Mail on 10/27/2020 Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.