Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Orlando Esquivel, against Palomo, Miguel Angel, represented by Roberto Meza, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Luis M. Singleterry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLuis M. Singleterry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryFugitive Warrant |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Order Returned by Court
Date: April 13, 2021Waiver of Extradition Proceedings, Signed
Date: April 12, 2021Proposed Order
Date: April 09, 2021Fugitive Warrant (OCA)
Date: March 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing Other CANCELED Status Hearing (1:00 PM) () Other 30 DAY STATUS |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (1:00 PM) () 30 DAY STATUS 30 DAY STATUS |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Phone Call TO ATTORNEY ROBERT MESA-INFORM DEF RELEASED-HEARING CANCELED. TO ATTORNEY ROBERT MESA-INFORM DEF RELEASED-HEARING CANCELED. |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries DEFENDANT RELEASED TO ANOTHER AGENCY ON 4/22/21 DEFENDANT RELEASED TO ANOTHER AGENCY ON 4/22/21 |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court WAIVER OF EXTRADITION PROCEEDINGS WAIVER OF EXTRADITION PROCEEDINGS |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Extradition Proceedings, Signed | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue WAIVER OF EXTRADITION PROCEEDINGS WAIVER OF EXTRADITION PROCEEDINGS |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order WAIVER OF EXTRADITION WAIVER OF EXTRADITION |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue WAIVER OF EXTRADITION PROCEEDINGS WAIVER OF EXTRADITION PROCEEDINGS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.