Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Catarina S. Alvarado, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRamon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeOther |
Order of Commitment, Signed
Date: March 31, 2021Proposed Order
Date: March 31, 2021Motion
Date: March 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order C-1133-21-J ORDER OF RELEASE-COMMITMENT C-1133-21-J ORDER OF RELEASE-COMMITMENT Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ramon, Israel, Jr.) SO 01482661 DOB 10.30.99 JAIL SO 01482661 DOB 10.30.99 JAIL Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent AMENDED APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION AMENDED APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Writ of Habeas Corpus, Signed SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER - AMENDED APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION ORDER - AMENDED APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Signed Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER SETTING HEARING AMENDED APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION ORDER SETTING HEARING AMENDED APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Returned Order on Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Seeking Bail Reduction filed 3/29/21 to Clerk. Order NOT signed. Agreed Order signed by Court. Returned Order on Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Seeking Bail Reduction filed 3/29/21 to Clerk. Order NOT signed. Agreed Order signed by Court. Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Returned Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Seeking Bail Reduction filed 3/29/21 to Clerk. Writ NOT signed. Court heard case on 3/31/21. Returned Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Seeking Bail Reduction filed 3/29/21 to Clerk. Writ NOT signed. Court heard case on 3/31/21. Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent AGREED ORDER AGREED ORDER Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.