Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Robert C Steindel, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Mancias, Fernando G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMancias, Fernando G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Proposed Order
Date: March 24, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: March 25, 2021Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: March 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Release, Signed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Writ of Habeas Corpus, Signed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Alternative Incarceration Program, Signed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G)
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Called HELD. Appearing were Atty. Robert Steindel and Defendant from Jail. Defendant is charged with Assault with Weapon with bond of $60,000.00. Judge reduced bond to $5000 c/s with AIP, no contact with alleged victim. HELD. Appearing were Atty. Robert Steindel and Defendant from Jail. Defendant is charged with Assault with Weapon with bond of $60,000.00. Judge reduced bond to $5000 c/s with AIP, no contact with alleged victim. Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Writ Issued Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORER SETTING ON WHC ORER SETTING ON WHC Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ RAMIREZ, MAURINE PRICHARD Served 03/25/2021 Returned 03/26/2021
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.