Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Yzaguirre, Frances Mosty, Yzaguirre, Roberto Jose, filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases (Oca) case represented by Shannon E. Loyd, against United Services Automobile Association, represented by Thomas E. Sanders, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Jose A. Ramirez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJose A. Ramirez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed With Prejudice |
Court Costs Paid
Date: August 04, 2022Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: July 20, 2022Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed
Date: July 20, 2022Notice of Non-Suit, Filed
Date: July 19, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: April 28, 2022Proposed Order
Date: April 19, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 19, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: April 19, 2022Notice Sent
Date: April 13, 2022Notice Sent
Date: October 21, 2021Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: October 20, 2021Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: September 07, 2021Citation Issued
Date: March 30, 2021Answer
Date: April 23, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: March 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Joe) Other Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing Other CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Joe) Other Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Paid PARTY INCURRED PARTY INCURRED Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed
Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit, Filed
Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND MEDIATION ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND MEDIATION Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CRT. HAS BEEN ADVISED BY ATTY.KEVIN SANCHEZ-THEY WILL NO LONGER NEED THE ORDER SETTING FOR THE MOTION TO COMPEL. ATTY.SANCHEZ IS TO NOTIFY OPP.CNSL ; OSH WILL BE RETURNED/REJECTED-SF CRT. HAS BEEN ADVISED BY ATTY.KEVIN SANCHEZ-THEY WILL NO LONGER NEED THE ORDER SETTING FOR THE MOTION TO COMPEL. ATTY.SANCHEZ IS TO NOTIFY OPP.CNSL ; OSH WILL BE RETURNED/REJECTED-SF Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.