Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Blue Bridge Financial, Llc, As Assignee Of Nations First Capital, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by John Robert Jones, against Er Transportation, Llc, Rosas, Efrain, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Singleterry, Luis M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSingleterry, Luis M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Abstract of Judgement (Fee)
Date: June 23, 2023Costing Note
Date: June 13, 2023Bill of Cost
Date: April 27, 2023Request for Service
Date: June 12, 2023Notice of 239a Default Judgment Sent
Date: April 21, 2023Default Judgment, Signed
Date: April 21, 2023Proposed Order
Date: January 25, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: January 25, 2023Proposed Order
Date: April 20, 2023Request
Date: January 25, 2023Motion for Default Judgment
Date: January 25, 2023Proposed Order
Date: January 25, 2023Citation Issued
Date: March 23, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: March 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgement (Fee)
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Abstract. ER Transportation, LLC Unserved
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Costing Note BILL OF COST FOR ABSTRACT BILL OF COST FOR ABSTRACT Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Service ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bill of Cost $329.00 DUE FROM DEFENDANTS AS PER COURT ORDER TO RECOVER SO PLAINTIFF CAN BE REFUNDED $329.00 DUE FROM DEFENDANTS AS PER COURT ORDER TO RECOVER SO PLAINTIFF CAN BE REFUNDED Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of 239a Default Judgment Sent
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment, Signed
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice ER Transportation, LLC Served 04/25/2023 Returned 04/25/2023 Rosas, Efrain Served 04/25/2023 Returned 04/25/2023
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice ER Transportation, LLC Unserved Rosas, Efrain Unserved
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order DEFAULT JUDGMENT DEFAULT JUDGMENT Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.