Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Robert M. Capello, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Reyna, Rose G. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReyna, Rose G. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeOther |
Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: March 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tickler (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) CLERKS TO DISPOSE CASE 04/13/2021 Reset by Court to 04/27/2021 CLERKS TO DISPOSE CASE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order COURT ORDER MODIFYING CONDITIONS OF BONDS COURT ORDER MODIFYING CONDITIONS OF BONDS Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue COURT ORDER MODIFYING CONTIDITIONS OF BONDS COURT ORDER MODIFYING CONTIDITIONS OF BONDS Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR BOND REDUCTION AND APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR BOND REDUCTION AND APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR BOND REDUCTION AND APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR BOND REDUCTION AND APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED; DEFENDANT PRESENT VIA ZOOM; ATTY. ROBERT CAPELLO PRESENT VIA ZOOM; ATTY. JOAQUIN ZAMORA/DANICA CARMAN PRESENT VIA ZOOM; CO JUAN ARELLANO PRESENT VIA ZOOM; CASE CONTINUED WITH PROFFER; THE COURT KEPT THE BOND AT THE CURRENT BOND; THE COURT ORDERED AS CONDITIONS OF BOND THAT DEFT TO REFRAIN FROM ANY DRUGS AND ALCOHOL, IGNITION INTERLOCK WITH PHOTO CAPABILITY TO BE INSTALLED WITH 24 HOURS OF BEING RELEASED CASE CALLED; DEFENDANT PRESENT VIA ZOOM; ATTY. ROBERT CAPELLO PRESENT VIA ZOOM; ATTY. JOAQUIN ZAMORA/DANICA CARMAN PRESENT VIA ZOOM; CO JUAN ARELLANO PRESENT VIA ZOOM; CASE CONTINUED WITH PROFFER; THE COURT KEPT THE BOND AT THE CURRENT BOND; THE COURT ORDERED AS CONDITIONS OF BOND THAT DEFT TO REFRAIN FROM ANY DRUGS AND ALCOHOL, IGNITION INTERLOCK WITH PHOTO CAPABILITY TO BE INSTALLED WITH 24 HOURS OF BEING RELEASED Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR BOND REDUCTION AND APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; SENT TO D/C QUEUE ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR BOND REDUCTION AND APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; SENT TO D/C QUEUE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) JAIL JAIL JAIL SO 01470941 (SPANISH) JAIL JAIL JAIL SO 01470941 (SPANISH) Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Email sent to attorneys with link to appear via Zoom on 4/7/21 Email sent to attorneys with link to appear via Zoom on 4/7/21 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Writ Issued Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.