Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Kay Medical Center, Pllc, Khit & Associates, L.L.C. D B A Khit Chiropractic & Wellness Centers, Skak Investments, L.L.C. D B A Insight Diagnostics & Imaging Centers, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adrian Lozano, Lance Christopher Kassab, against Law Offices Of Ezequiel Reyna, Jr. P.C., Reyna, Ezequiel, Jr., Ruiz, Gustavo C, Ruiz Law Center, Pllc, represented by Raymond L. Thomas, Timothy Micah Dortch, William L. Pope, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Israel Ramon, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsrael Ramon, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract (Oca) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: March 17, 2023Motion for No Evidence Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: June 24, 2022Designation of Experts
Date: November 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Plaintiffs' Motion to Redact Sensitive Information and Mark Records as Confidential Plaintiffs' Motion to Redact Sensitive Information and Mark Records as Confidential |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLTFS MOTNO TO REDACT SENSITIVE INFORMATION AND MARK RECORDS AS CONFIDENTIAL ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLTFS MOTNO TO REDACT SENSITIVE INFORMATION AND MARK RECORDS AS CONFIDENTIAL |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REDACT SENSITIVE INFORMATION AND MARK RECORDS AS CONFIDENTIAL ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REDACT SENSITIVE INFORMATION AND MARK RECORDS AS CONFIDENTIAL |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ON PLTFS MOTION TO REDACT SENSITIVE INFORMATION AND MARK RECORDS AS CONFIDENTIAL ON PLTFS MOTION TO REDACT SENSITIVE INFORMATION AND MARK RECORDS AS CONFIDENTIAL |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REDACT SENSITIVE INFORMATION AND MARK RECORDS AS CONFIDENTIAL ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REDACT SENSITIVE INFORMATION AND MARK RECORDS AS CONFIDENTIAL |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REDACT SENSITIVE INFORMATION AND MARK RECORDS AS CONFIDENTIAL ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REDACT SENSITIVE INFORMATION AND MARK RECORDS AS CONFIDENTIAL |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits Other CANCELED Trial on Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Other |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Trial on Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramon, Israel, Jr.) | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion TO REDACT SENSITIVE INFORMATION AND MARK RECORDS AS CONFIDENTIAL TO REDACT SENSITIVE INFORMATION AND MARK RECORDS AS CONFIDENTIAL |
|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REDACT SENSITIVE INFORMATION AND MARK RECORDS AS CONFIDENTIAL GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REDACT SENSITIVE INFORMATION AND MARK RECORDS AS CONFIDENTIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.