Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Eloy I. Hernandez, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with LETTY LOPEZ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLETTY LOPEZ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeOther |
Order on Writ of Habeas Corpus, Signed
Date: April 08, 2021Order Returned by Court
Date: March 22, 2021Proposed Order
Date: March 19, 2021Writ Issued
Date: March 30, 2021Notice Sent
Date: March 30, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: March 30, 2021Order of Transfer
Date: March 22, 2021Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: March 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived HABEAS CORPUS HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Lopez, Letty) Comment (Writ is Granted. Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (count 1), and Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (Count 2). Bond to remain the same 0n charge for Engaged in Organized Crime. |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tickler (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) ORD# 52233010- CHECK DISP ORD# 52233010- CHECK DISP Judge: Lopez, Letty) Comment (Writ is Granted. Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (count 1), and Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (Count 2). Bond to remain the same 0n charge for Engaged in Organized Crime. |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Writ of Habeas Corpus, Signed
Judge: Lopez, Letty) Comment (Writ is Granted. Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (count 1), and Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (Count 2). Bond to remain the same 0n charge for Engaged in Organized Crime. |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Commitment, Signed BOND REDCUED TO $2,500 C/S PENDING TRIAL SIGNED BY JUDGE LETTY LOPEZ. (MAN DEL PG 2 4<200 CT. 1) BOND REDCUED TO $2,500 C/S PENDING TRIAL SIGNED BY JUDGE LETTY LOPEZ. (MAN DEL PG 2 4<200 CT. 1) Judge: Lopez, Letty) Comment (Writ is Granted. Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (count 1), and Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (Count 2). Bond to remain the same 0n charge for Engaged in Organized Crime. |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Commitment, Signed BOND REDCUED TO $2,500 C/S PENDING TRIAL SIGNED BY JUDGE LETTY LOPEZ. (MAN DEL PG 2 4<200 CT. 2) BOND REDCUED TO $2,500 C/S PENDING TRIAL SIGNED BY JUDGE LETTY LOPEZ. (MAN DEL PG 2 4<200 CT. 2) Judge: Lopez, Letty) Comment (Writ is Granted. Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (count 1), and Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (Count 2). Bond to remain the same 0n charge for Engaged in Organized Crime. |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order CT 2 ORDER OF COMMITMENT CT 2 ORDER OF COMMITMENT Judge: Lopez, Letty) Comment (Writ is Granted. Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (count 1), and Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (Count 2). Bond to remain the same 0n charge for Engaged in Organized Crime. |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ORDER DISPOSING WHC ORDER DISPOSING WHC Judge: Lopez, Letty) Comment (Writ is Granted. Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (count 1), and Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (Count 2). Bond to remain the same 0n charge for Engaged in Organized Crime. |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER DISPOSING WHC ORDER DISPOSING WHC Judge: Lopez, Letty) Comment (Writ is Granted. Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (count 1), and Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (Count 2). Bond to remain the same 0n charge for Engaged in Organized Crime. |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ORDER DISPOSING WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SIGNED BY JUDGE LETTY LOPEZ. AG ORDER DISPOSING WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SIGNED BY JUDGE LETTY LOPEZ. AG Judge: Lopez, Letty) Comment (Writ is Granted. Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (count 1), and Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (Count 2). Bond to remain the same 0n charge for Engaged in Organized Crime. |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order CT 1 ORDER OF COMMITMENT CT 1 ORDER OF COMMITMENT Judge: Lopez, Letty) Comment (Writ is Granted. Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (count 1), and Bond reduced t0 $2,500 CASH/SURETY 0n charge for Man Del PG 2 4<200 (Count 2). Bond to remain the same 0n charge for Engaged in Organized Crime. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.